05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/28/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (April 20). | |||
04/14/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/13/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/06/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |