|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|