|
08/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 136, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5996.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4202.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5054.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|