|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4483.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5160.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|