|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected June 16.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 5. Page 1833.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|