|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 4452.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 3. Page 5190.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|