06/03/2010 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member De Leon. | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5). | |||
05/04/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/28/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/22/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |