06/07/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/13/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4942.) | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |