LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2191
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2191
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2191
Compare Versions
AB2191 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2191 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB2191 Amended August 18, 2010
AB2191 Amended June 21, 2010
AB2191 Amended May 27, 2010
AB2191 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2191 Amended March 18, 2010
AB2191 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2191 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2191 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB2191 Amended August 18, 2010
AB2191 Amended June 21, 2010
AB2191 Amended May 27, 2010
AB2191 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2191 Amended March 18, 2010
AB2191 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare