|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3886.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|