LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2200
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2200
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2200
Action History
05/28/2010
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/21/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
04/07/2010
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
03/11/2010
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
02/19/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
02/18/2010
Read first time. To print.