|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 6924.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Ordered to third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 5025.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Corrected June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5080.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|