|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 4817.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|