California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2213 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 22, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010