|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 17. Noes 9. Page 5084.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5010.) Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4862.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Padilla. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4899.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5243.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|