|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5249.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|