05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/05/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
04/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |