|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 6731.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4844.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3912.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|