|
08/05/2010
|
From Senate committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5463.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|