05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |||
03/16/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/15/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |