06/24/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/24/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 20. Page 5279.) | |||
05/17/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12). | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |