|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 382, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 65. Noes 7. Page 6262.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 4460.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 5034.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|