11/30/2010 | From Senate committee without further action. | |||
06/23/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/28/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 14. Page 5347.) | |||
05/11/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 5). | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |