|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4599.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 5509.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|