|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 5575.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5390.).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|