06/03/2010 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Bass. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/01/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 7). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/05/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 20). | |||
04/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |