|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Kehoe.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 1875.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|