|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5186.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (April 7).
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|