LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2267
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2267
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2267
Action History
05/04/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/16/2010
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
03/15/2010
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
03/11/2010
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
02/21/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
02/18/2010
Read first time. To print.