|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4099.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4852.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|