BILL NUMBER: AB 2268CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 93 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 15, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 15, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 28, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chesbro FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to add Section 11223 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to alcohol and drug abuse. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2268, Chesbro. Alcohol and drug abuse. Existing law, with certain exceptions, requires any narcotic controlled substance employed in treating an addict for addiction to be administered by a physician and surgeon, a registered nurse acting under the instruction of a physician and surgeon, or a licensed physician assistant acting under the patient-specific authority of his or her physician and surgeon supervisor, as specified. Existing law prohibits a person from treating an addict for addiction to a narcotic drug except in specified locations, including, a facility licensed by the State Department of Alcohol and Drug Programs, as specified. Existing law restricts the amounts of certain controlled substances that a physician treating an addict for addiction may prescribe for or furnish to the addict during each day of treatment, as specified. Existing federal law requires a practitioner, including a physician and surgeon, who dispenses narcotics to individuals for maintenance treatment or detoxification treatment to annually register with the federal Attorney General for that purpose. Under existing federal law, this requirement is waived if specified circumstances exist. This bill would authorize a physician and surgeon who is registered with the federal Attorney General pursuant to the above-described federal law to provide treatment for addiction pursuant to this federal law. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 11223 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 11223. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a physician and surgeon who is registered with the federal Attorney General pursuant to Section 823(g) of Title 21 of the United States Code may provide treatment for addiction pursuant to this federal law.