|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5847.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4056.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (June 10).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4452.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|