|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 5006.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Liu.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4451.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Liu. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4464.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5035.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|