|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6720.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6557.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4602.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5088.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|