California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2279 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 9, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill June 15, 2010