LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB228
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB228
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB228
Compare Versions
AB228 Amended June 17, 2010
AB228 Amended May 24, 2010
AB228 Amended May 10, 2010
AB228 Amended February 19, 2010
AB228 Amended June 22, 2009
AB228 Amended April 20, 2009
AB228 Amended April 2, 2009
AB228 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB228 Amended June 17, 2010
AB228 Amended May 24, 2010
AB228 Amended May 10, 2010
AB228 Amended February 19, 2010
AB228 Amended June 22, 2009
AB228 Amended April 20, 2009
AB228 Amended April 2, 2009
AB228 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare