|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6707.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 6750.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4874.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 9).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 1). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5521.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|