|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6711.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4826.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5479.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|