06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
05/20/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 23. Page 5250.) | |||
05/17/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 12). | |||
04/28/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 19). | |||
04/05/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |