|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6397.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4582.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 8. Page 4976.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 4934.).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|