08/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
07/01/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
01/19/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
01/19/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3816.) | |||
01/13/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
01/12/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 11). | |||
01/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
01/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/06/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | |||
02/05/2009 | Read first time. To print. |