|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6707.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6736.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4870.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 5411.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|