|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6835.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6707.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4872.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5481.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5339.).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|