04/20/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (March 25). | |||
03/18/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
03/17/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |