|
08/18/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Fletcher.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4459.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4197.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4199.) Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5083.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|