05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
04/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |