05/20/2010 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/13/2010 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/06/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/23/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |