|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 6804.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6707.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4861.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 20. Noes 14. Page 4590.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Kehoe. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4590.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 5199.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|