LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2322
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2322
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2322
Compare Versions
AB2322 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2322 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB2322 Amended August 19, 2010
AB2322 Amended August 5, 2010
AB2322 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2322 Amended May 13, 2010
AB2322 Amended April 29, 2010
AB2322 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2322 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2322 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB2322 Amended August 19, 2010
AB2322 Amended August 5, 2010
AB2322 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2322 Amended May 13, 2010
AB2322 Amended April 29, 2010
AB2322 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare