|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 596, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4584.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 5250.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|